Global Patent Index - EP 1029606 A1

EP 1029606 A1 2000-08-23 - Method for the production of metal tubes, in particular copper tubes and transport structure

Title (en)

Method for the production of metal tubes, in particular copper tubes and transport structure

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rohren aus Metall, insbesondere Kupferrohren, und Transportgestell

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de tuyaux métalliques en particulier tuyaux en cuivre et dispositif de transport

Publication

EP 1029606 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103277 A

Priority

EP 99103277 A

Abstract (en)

Metal tube production includes using frames to transport large stacked tube coils between separate semi-finished and finished tube manufacturing locations. A metal tube production process comprises: (a) producing semi-finished tubes by extrusion or hot rolling and subsequent drawing at a separate manufacturing location; (b) winding the tubes to large coils which are placed on transport and/or pay-out frames, each frame holding several stacked large coils; (c) transporting the loaded frames to a tube manufacturing location; (d) unloading the coils from the frames or placing a loaded frame on a lowerable pay-out table immediately in front of the tube manufacturing line and positioning the coil leading end at the working height; and (e) uncoiling and supplying the tubes to a conventional drawing machine for further processing to tubes. An Independent claim is also included for a transport frame for use in the above process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rohren aus Metall, insbesondere Kupferrohre, sowie ein Transportgestell für die zu Coils aufgewickelten Rohre. Ausgehend von den Nachteilen des bekannten Standes der Technik ist es Aufgabe, ein Verfahren zu schaffen, das eine verbesserte Auslastung der Fertigungsanlagen sowie eine besonders wirtschaftliche Fertigung ermöglicht und mit dem Fertigrohre einfach und kostengünstig produziert werden können. Ferner soll ein geeignetes Transportgestell für die zu Großcoils aufgewickelten Rohre geschaffen werden. Als Lösung wird vorgeschlagen, daß in einer gesonderten Fertigungsstätte durch Strangpressen oder Warmwalzen und nachfolgendes Ziehen aufwickelbare Vorrohre hergestellt und zu Großcoils aufgewickelt werden, die auf als Transport- und/oder Ablaufeinrichtung dienenden Gestellen abgelegt werden, wobei jeweils auf einem Gestell mehrere Großcoils gestapelt werden, die Gestelle mit den Großcoils zu einer Rohrfertigungsstätte transportiert werden, und unmittelbar vor der Rohrfertigungslinie entweder die Großcoils von den Gestellen abgestapelt oder das jeweilige Gestell mit den Großcoils auf einem versenkbaren Ablauftisch abgestellt wird und der jeweilige Coilanfang in Arbeitshöhe positioniert, das Coil abgehaspelt und einer konventionellen Ziehmaschine zugeführt und zu Rohren weiterverarbeitet wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/32; B21C 37/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/22 (2006.01); B21C 37/06 (2006.01); B21C 47/18 (2006.01); B21C 47/28 (2006.01); B65H 75/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/18 (2013.01); B21C 1/22 (2013.01); B21C 37/06 (2013.01); B21C 47/28 (2013.01); B65H 75/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029606 A1 20000823; EP 1029606 B1 20020918; AR 022599 A1 20020904; AT 224247 T 20021015; BR 0000848 A 20000912; CA 2299012 A1 20000819; DE 59902740 D1 20021024; DK 1029606 T3 20021230; ES 2183446 T3 20030316; PT 1029606 E 20030228

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060904

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LAMITREF INDUSTRIES N.V.

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060220

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060219

2006-10-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060219

2006-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060219

2005-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183446 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-02-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404390

2003-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902740 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224247 T 20021015

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI