Global patent index - EP 1029609 A3

EP 1029609 A3 2001-04-18 - Set of rollers for a profiling installation and method for the production thereof

Title (en)

Set of rollers for a profiling installation and method for the production thereof

Title (de)

Rollensatz für eine Profilieranlage und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Jeu de rouleaux pour machine de profilage et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1029609 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121480 A

Priority

  • DE 19908509 A
  • DE 19906188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029609A2] Individual rollers (12,14,1,618) of the set (10) are constructed from separate connected discs, which are pref. welded together. Each disc has several evenly distributed apertures in its circumference. The discs are positioned angle-offset relative to the rotary axis, and are welded together in the area of the apertures. The discs are cut and/or welded together by a Laser process. The rollers are turned, and the turned surfaces are finished by plasma coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/08; B21B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029609 A2 20000823; EP 1029609 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040115

2002-05-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: JENSEN A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21D 5/08 A, 7B 21B 27/02 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI