Global Patent Index - EP 1029614 A1

EP 1029614 A1 2000-08-23 - Flow-turning device and method for forming a workpiece

Title (en)

Flow-turning device and method for forming a workpiece

Title (de)

Drückwalzvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Umformen eines Werkstückes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fluotournage et procédé pour former une pièce

Publication

EP 1029614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124490 A

Priority

  • DE 29903049 U
  • DE 19929224 A

Abstract (en)

At least two rolling elements (5) are rotatably installed at least in one rolling element holder (3). For a joint contact with the workpiece (1) the at least two rolling elements (5) in the rolling element holder (3) are arranged approximately at the same distance from the axis of rotation of the rolling unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Drückwalzvorrichtung mit einer um eine Rotationsachse drehbaren Spindel, einem Rotationsantrieb für die Spindel, einem an der Spindel angeordneten Drückfutter (12) zur Aufnahme eines Werkstückes (10) und mindestens einem radial zustellbaren Umformwerkzeug (18), wobei mindestens eine ringförmige Anschlageinrichtung (14) vorgesehen ist, welche einen Bereich des Drückfutters (12) zur Bildung eines Ringspaltes mit radialem Abstand umgibt, und der Ringspalt zur Aufnahme eines Abschnittes des Werkstückes (10) ausgebildet ist. Bei einer anderen Ausführung der erfindungsgemäßen Drückwalzvorrichtung sind als Umformwerkzeug mindestens zwei Rollkörper vorgesehen, die an mindestens einem Rollkörperhalter drehbar gelagert sind. Es wird ein Verfahren angegeben, mit welchem sich Werkstücke besonders materialschonend auf den erfindungsgemäßen Drückwalzvorrichtungen herstellen lassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/025 (2013.01); B21H 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029614 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI