Global Patent Index - EP 1029640 A2

EP 1029640 A2 2000-08-23 - Apparatus for transversely processing ply-material, in particular for transversely cutting paper

Title (en)

Apparatus for transversely processing ply-material, in particular for transversely cutting paper

Title (de)

Querbearbeiter für Lagenmaterial, insbesondere Querschneider für Papier

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour opérer de façon transversale sur une couche de matériau, en particulier pour découper transversalement du papier

Publication

EP 1029640 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101838 A

Priority

DE 19907357 A

Abstract (en)

The supports (2,3,4,5) with cutters (6,7) and a guide (8) permit alternate operation of cutters. These serve as a facility enabling a guide table (41,42) to move into the gap (58) between the work places (11,12). Frames flanking the work units (15,16,17,18) with an adjustable distance (13) and the spaced distance (14), supplement tools (23,24,25,26).

Abstract (de)

Ein Querschneider (1) weist einen Synchronschneider (6) und unmittelbar benachbart einen dynamisch variablen Querschneider (7) auf, von denen jeweils einer stillgesetzt wird, wenn der andere arbeitet. Der stillgesetzte Einzelschneider (6 bzw. 7) bildet einen Durchlaß (52) für einen Führungstisch (41 bzw. 42), der in den Abstandsraum (58) zwischen den Arbeitsebenen (11, 12) eingefahren wird. Dadurch können ohne große Umrüstarbeiten zahlreiche unterschiedliche Formate geschnitten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/16 (2006.01); B26D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029640 A2 20000823; EP 1029640 A3 20010912; DE 19907357 A1 20000824; JP 2000238149 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020209

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 26D 11/00 A, 7B 65H 35/08 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI