Global Patent Index - EP 1029643 A1

EP 1029643 A1 2000-08-23 - Stapling controlling device

Title (en)

Stapling controlling device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle der Heftung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler l' agrafage

Publication

EP 1029643 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810135 A

Priority

EP 99810135 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a measurement arrangement (9) mounted on the stapler (1), with which state changes of the stapler are detected during stapling of products (2) and compared with predefined values. The changes in state of a bending device or a stapling head are detected.

Abstract (de)

Zur Kontrolle der Heftung von Produkten (2) sind an der Drahtheftvorrichtung (1) Messmittel (9) angeordnet, mit denen während einer Heftung Zustandsänderungen der Drahtheftvorrichtung (1) ermittelt und mit vorgegebenen Werten (F) verglichen werden. Vorzugsweise werden Zustandsänderungen des Umbiegerstössels (7) der Drahtheftvorrichtung (1) ermittelt. Die Messmittel sind vorzugsweise durch einen Dehnmessstreifen (9) oder einen Piezokristall realisiert. Störungen bei der Heftung können sofort erkannt werden und damit ein unnötiger Materialverbrauch vermieden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27F 7/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 7/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27F 7/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029643 A1 20000823; EP 1029643 B1 20051228; DE 59912985 D1 20060202

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912985 P 20060202

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041013

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI