Global Patent Index - EP 1029677 A2

EP 1029677 A2 2000-08-23 - Ink jet head

Title (en)

Ink jet head

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1029677 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102986 A

Priority

JP 3656099 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet head (1), comprises an ink chamber (4) provided with a nozzle through which an ink is jetted; an actuator (5) to jet the ink accommodated in the ink chamber through the nozzle; an electrode (7) to drive the actuator; and a circuit board (6) having a through-hole (8); wherein a part of the electrode is led outside through the through-hole in the circuit board. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14491 (2013.01); B41J 2202/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029677 A2 20000823; EP 1029677 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050914

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040924

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI