Global Patent Index - EP 1029683 A1

EP 1029683 A1 2000-08-23 - Independent servicing of multiple inkjet printheads

Title (en)

Independent servicing of multiple inkjet printheads

Title (de)

Unabhängige Reinigung für mehrere Tintenstrahldruckköpfe

Title (fr)

Nettoyage indépendant pour plusieurs têtes d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1029683 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99110496 A

Priority

US 25338199 A

Abstract (en)

Service station components for interacting with one type of printhead are located to be aligned in operative position only in a first servicing mode, and service station components for interacting with another type of printhead are differently located to be aligned in operative position only in a second servicing mode. This allows for different servicing schemes of two or more modes to be applied based on the individual characteristics of the ink and/or nozzle plates employed in inkjet printheads. In some instances, an individual printhead can be serviced in more than one servicing mode. In a preferred embodiment, replaceable service station units are provided for each different printhead. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16538 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029683 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI