Global Patent Index - EP 1029699 A1

EP 1029699 A1 2000-08-23 - Printer, control method for the same, and data storage medium

Title (en)

Printer, control method for the same, and data storage medium

Title (de)

Drucker, Steuerungsverfahren dafür und Datenspeichermedium

Title (fr)

Imprimante, procédé de commande associé et support d'enregistrement de données

Publication

EP 1029699 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00103318 A

Priority

JP 4167999 A

Abstract (en)

Problems relating to shifting and misalignment of an ink ribbon relative to the print head as a result of changing the color used for printing with a multi-color ink ribbon are eliminated with the least possible drop in printing throughput. The ink ribbon (13) can be wound in conjunction with print head (14) movement, and has a plurality of ink colors arranged in a direction perpendicular to the ribbon winding direction. A switching mechanism changes the relative position of the print head (14) to the ink ribbon (13) in the direction perpendicular to the ink ribbon winding direction. If after such change the distance l of print head movement to the next print start position accompanied by ink ribbon winding is smaller than a specific distance L needed to correct any misalignment of the ink ribbon to the print head, a controller moves the print head in a non-printing winding mode by a distance of at least L-l to wind the ribbon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/00 (2006.01); B41J 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029699 A1 20000823; EP 1029699 B1 20021113; CN 1138644 C 20040218; CN 1263824 A 20000823; DE 60000748 D1 20021219; DE 60000748 T2 20030703; HK 1030193 A1 20041217; KR 100463282 B1 20041229; KR 20000058097 A 20000925; US 6431774 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60000748

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110218

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000748 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI