Global Patent Index - EP 1029763 A1

EP 1029763 A1 2000-08-23 - Installation for transporting persons,especially for invalids, and construction of this installation especially based on an escalator

Title (en)

Installation for transporting persons,especially for invalids, and construction of this installation especially based on an escalator

Title (de)

Anlage zur Beförderung von Personen, insbesondere von körperlich Behinderten, und Errichtung dieser Anlage ausgehend von insbesondere einer Rolltreppe

Title (fr)

Installation de transport de personnes, en particulier à mobilité réduite et mise en place de cette installation à partir notamment d'un escalier mécanique.

Publication

EP 1029763 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400437 A

Priority

FR 9902114 A

Abstract (en)

Invention is intended for installation in building with unobstructed passage (11), inclined at about 30 degrees , between two floors (2, 3), compartments (9, 10) being formed below floor level on the respective landings to accommodate terminal equipment. Motor (12) driving winch drum (13) is on upper landing, and buffers (18) on lower landing. Cable hauls cabin (4) supported on 4 rollers (19, 20), running on guide rails (17), over emergency staircase (14) and giving access to entry trap (15) for motor compartment (10).

Abstract (fr)

Installation de transport de personnes et/ou de marchandises, apte au transport de personnes à mobilité réduite et aux personnes en fauteuil roulant notamment, comprenant en combinaison : Une structure de génie civil et un châssis du type employé pour les escaliers mécaniques ; Au moins une cabine entraînée en va et vient sur un trajet correspondant à celui qu'effectuerait les marches d'un escalier mécanique complet correspondant audit châssis. L'invention se rapporte également à un procédé de mise en place de ladite installation, en particulier à partir d'un escalier mécanique préexistant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 9/00; B66B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2006.01); B66B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2013.01); B66B 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029763 A1 20000823; CA 2372057 A1 20000824; CA 2372057 C 20090915; FR 2789958 A1 20000825; FR 2789958 B1 20010608; US 2002074188 A1 20020620; WO 0048886 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040106

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI