Global Patent Index - EP 1029786 A2

EP 1029786 A2 2000-08-23 - Device for banderoling a package goods unit with a shrinkable banderole

Title (en)

Device for banderoling a package goods unit with a shrinkable banderole

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Beanderolieren einer Packguteinheit mit einer Schrumpffolienbaderole

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour banderoler une unité de marchandises avec une banderole rétractable

Publication

EP 1029786 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102609 A

Priority

DE 29902910 U

Abstract (en)

An assembly applies a shrink-foil band or strap to a product (3). The assembly has a gate and frame with a conveyor (1) transporting the product through the gate. The shrink-foil strap is applied by powered rollers and the ends are joined. The foil roller axles are esp. horizontal, and the foil strap is diverted during application.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Banderolieren einer Packguteinheit mit einer Schrumpffolienbanderole, mit einem ein Tor (8) bildenden Gestell (9), mit einem sich durch das Tor erstreckenden Förderer (1) für die Packguteinheit, mit antreibbaren Schrumpffolienrollen (11), deren Folienbahnen (12) an ihren Enden miteinander verbunden sind und im Tor einen Schrumpffolienvorhang bilden sowie mit beidseits des Tors angeordneten, gegeneinander beweglichen Doppelschweißbalken. Um den Wechsel von Schrumpffolienbahnen zu erleichtern, sollen die Achsen der Schrumpffolienrollen sich horizontal erstrecken und sollen Umlenkeinrichtungen (13) für die von den Schrumpffolienrollen zum Vorhang laufenden Folienbahnen vorgesehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/02 (2006.01); B65B 9/02 (2006.01); B65B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • FR 2606366 B1 19890713 - NEWTEC INT [FR]
  • FR 2686313 A1 19930723 - THIMON JACQUES [FR]
  • "Band-Stretcher", ANNOUNCEMENT STEINLE MASCHINENFABRIK, XX, XX, 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XX, pages 1 - 2, XP002947691
  • Notice technique DRAPAL de la société Thimon, publiée en Juin 1984 (Page 7, Drapal 6000)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902910 U1 20000330; AT 294734 T 20050515; BR 0000651 A 20000926; CA 2298949 A1 20000819; CA 2298949 C 20060725; CN 1167580 C 20040922; CN 1268467 A 20001004; CZ 20000556 A3 20010117; CZ 296189 B6 20060111; DE 50010201 D1 20050609; DK 1029786 T3 20050822; EP 1029786 A2 20000823; EP 1029786 A3 20011017; EP 1029786 B1 20050504; ES 2241514 T3 20051101; HU 0000529 A2 20000828; HU 0000529 A3 20011228; HU 0000529 D0 20000428; HU 224172 B1 20050628; KR 100391238 B1 20030712; KR 20010029567 A 20010406; PL 192668 B1 20061130; PL 338436 A1 20000828; SK 2242000 A3 20000912; SK 285336 B6 20061103; TR 200000448 A2 20010321; US 6474051 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MSK-VERPACKUNGS-SYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241514 T3

2005-10-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-08-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010201 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI