Global patent index - EP 1029791 A2

EP 1029791 A2 2000-08-23 - Method and device for packaging small articles in a stacked arrangement

Title (en)

Method and device for packaging small articles in a stacked arrangement

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken kleinstückiger Günter in gestapelter Anordnung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer de petits objets arrangés en pile

Publication

EP 1029791 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100453 A

Priority

DE 19906837 A

Abstract (en)

The device for packing small articles in a stack comprises a transporter (2,4) and a quality control device (3) which inspects the articles for defects and generates data about them. this is fed to a control device for a stacking machine. A separating device (5,6) is connected to the stacker and cooperates with the control device to remove defective articles. An Independent claim is included for a process for packing small articles.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Verpacken kleinstückiger Güter in gestapelter Anordnung, bei dem die Güter einzeln aufeinanderfolgend angefördert werden, werden die angeförderten Güter erfaßt und auf Fehler und/oder auf vollständiges Fehlen hin untersucht. Mehrere erfaßte Güter werden einer bestimmten Stapelverpackung zugeordnet. Bei Feststellung eines fehlerbehafteten oder vollständig fehlenden Gutes werden alle derjenigen Stapelverpackung zugeordneten Güter vor einem Endverpackungsvorgang ausgesondert, der auch das fehlerbehaftete oder fehlende Gut zugeordnet ist. Weiterhin wird eine entsprechende Vorrichtung angegeben. Hierdurch läßt sich bei hohem Durchsatz die Fehlerrate von fertigen Stangenverpackungen verringern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19860863 A1 20000706 - PACTEC VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN FA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029791 A2 20000823; EP 1029791 A3 20020515; EP 1029791 B1 20050406; DE 19906837 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110110

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110110

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110110

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65B 57/14 A

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI