Global Patent Index - EP 1029804 A2

EP 1029804 A2 2000-08-23 - Vacuum packaging bag

Title (en)

Vacuum packaging bag

Title (de)

Vakuumverpackungsbeutel

Title (fr)

Sachet pour emballage sous vide

Publication

EP 1029804 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103234 A

Priority

  • DE 29902787 U
  • DE 29909679 U

Abstract (en)

A plastic straw (3) is used to remove air from the inside of the bag part (2) in order to create a vacuum. The bag (1) is made from synthetic film heat welded in at least the region of the bag opening (5) to form an airtight weld. The straw used to remove air from the inside of the bag part has a material composition in at least the region where it passes through the bag wall enabling it to be welded to one of the bag sides.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Vakuumverpackungsbeutel, bestehend aus einer Kunststoffolie mit einer Beutelöffnung (5), wobei die zueinander weisenden Innenseiten des Vakuumverpackungsbeutels (1) zumindest in einem Abschnitt im Bereich der Beutelöffnung (5) unter Wärmeeinfluß miteinander zum Erstellen einer luftdichten Verschlußschweißnaht (7) verschweißbar sind, welchem Vakuumverpackungsbeutel (1) ein durch die Beutelöffnung (5) ins Beutelinnere hineinreichendes Entlüftungsmittel (3) zugeordnet ist das zumindest in seinem an den verschweißbaren Beutelbereich grenzenden Abschnitt Materialeigenschaften aufweist, die eine Verschweißung mit den Beutelinnenseiten erlauben. Als Entlüftungsmittel ist ein Kunststoffröhrchen (3) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/2023 (2013.01); B65D 81/2038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029804 A2 20000823; EP 1029804 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI