Global Patent Index - EP 1029817 A2

EP 1029817 A2 2000-08-23 - Gripping device

Title (en)

Gripping device

Title (de)

Greifervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de préhension

Publication

EP 1029817 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100879 A

Priority

US 25186199 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator (16) rotates the first clamp (14) relative to the second clamp (10), on the first spindle (12), from the open to the closed position. It has a carrier arm (18) rotating on a second spindle (20) non-parallel with spindle (12) and is linked to clamp (14) by a guided spiral spring. Carrier roller (22) gives controlled rotation of arm (18), with progressive increase in the spring tension to close the grab.

Abstract (de)

Eine Greifervorrichtung zum Greifen eines Druckproduktes umfaßt ein erstes Klemmorgan (14), das auf einer eine erste Achse bildenden ersten Achse (12) angebracht ist, sowie ein zweites Klemmorgan (10). Ferner ist ein Betätigungsorgan (16) vorgesehen, um das erste Klemmorgans (14) relativ zum zweiten Klemmorgan (10) um die erste Achse (12) von einer offenen Position in eine geschlossene Position zu drehen, in der die Greifervorrichtung ein Druckprodukt (30) ergreifen kann. Das Betätigungsorgan (16) weist einen Mitnehmerhebel (18) auf, der auf einer zweiten Achse (20) drehbar gelagert ist, die zur ersten Achse verschieden ist. Das Betätigungsorgan (16) ist durch mindestens eine geführte Spiralfeder (26) mit dem ersten Klemmorgan (14) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/14; B65H 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/04 (2006.01); B65G 47/86 (2006.01); B65H 5/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B66C 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/045 (2013.01); B65H 5/08 (2013.01); B65H 5/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029817 A2 20000823; EP 1029817 A3 20010110; EP 1029817 B1 20040414; CN 1263858 A 20000823; CZ 9904606 A3 20010815; DE 10001580 A1 20000824; DE 10001580 B4 20090409; DE 50006032 D1 20040519; JP 2000238240 A 20000905; US 6227588 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006032

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HEIDELBERG WEB SYSTEMS, INC.

2005-03-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006032 P 20040519

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI