Global Patent Index - EP 1029818 A2

EP 1029818 A2 2000-08-23 - Roll of sheet for use with a drug packaging device

Title (en)

Roll of sheet for use with a drug packaging device

Title (de)

Rolle von Bandmaterial zur Verwendung in einer Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Medikamenten

Title (fr)

Rouleau de matière en bande pour l'utilisation dans un dispositif d'emballage de médicaments

Publication

EP 1029818 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109244 A

Priority

  • EP 97115567 A
  • JP 25049296 A

Abstract (en)

It is desired to prevent disalignment of the edges of a folded sheet by smoothly feeding the sheet while keeping tension fluctuactions to a minimum when the sheet is unwound from a paper roll (R) set in a paper feed unit to a packaging unit even though the paper roll diameter decreases gradually as the sheet is unwound. A sheet length measuring sensor or rotary encoder is provided in the paper feed path through which the packaging sheet unwound from the paper roll is fed toward the packaging unit. An angle sensor (25) is provided which comprises Hall element sensors provide on a support shaft and magnets provided on a core pipe of the paper roll. Any change is the signals from one of these sensors relative to the signal from the other sensor is used to calculate the paper roll winding length, and the sheet tension is adjusted to an optimum, constant level by controlling the sheet braking force stepwise according to the roll diameter measured by the sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/04 (2006.01); B65B 47/02 (2006.01); B65H 16/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/06 (2006.01); B65H 23/08 (2006.01); B65H 75/10 (2006.01); B65H 75/18 (2006.01); B65H 77/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2013.01); B65H 16/005 (2013.01); B65H 16/103 (2013.01); B65H 23/063 (2013.01); B65H 75/182 (2013.01); B65H 2511/114 (2013.01); B65H 2511/142 (2013.01); B65H 2513/114 (2013.01); B65H 2553/22 (2013.01); B65H 2553/51 (2013.01); B65H 2801/81 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/142 + B65H 2220/03

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831048 A1 19980325; EP 0831048 B1 20020807; CA 2214597 A1 19980320; CA 2214597 C 20020402; CA 2316091 A1 19980320; CA 2316140 A1 19980320; CA 2316140 C 20031230; CN 1077080 C 20020102; CN 1162317 C 20040818; CN 1165472 C 20040908; CN 1178765 A 19980415; CN 1269318 A 20001011; CN 1356253 A 20020703; DE 69714535 D1 20020912; DE 69714535 T2 20021205; DE 69721084 D1 20030522; DE 69721084 T2 20031030; DE 69721591 D1 20030605; DE 69721591 T2 20040318; DK 0831048 T3 20021104; DK 1029818 T3 20030602; DK 1052211 T3 20030610; EP 1029818 A2 20000823; EP 1029818 A3 20000906; EP 1029818 B1 20030502; EP 1052211 A2 20001115; EP 1052211 A3 20010411; EP 1052211 B1 20030416; ES 2179986 T3 20030201; ES 2193914 T3 20031116; ES 2195816 T3 20031216; PT 1029818 E 20030829; PT 1052211 E 20030930; PT 831048 E 20021231; TW 348165 B 19981221

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170308

2017-05-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69721591

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150903

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-05-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130930

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070908

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060909

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060909

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2005-09-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2195816 T3

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402778

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69721591 P 20030605

2003-06-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0831048 P

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 831048

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT