Global patent index - EP 1029820 A2

EP 1029820 A2 2000-08-23 - Device for diverting sheets

Title (en)

Device for diverting sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Umlenken von Bogen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour dévier des feuilles

Publication

EP 1029820 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100237 A

Priority

US 25198399 A

Abstract (en)

The device for inverting a sheet of paper (4) in a stream being transported on one of two conveyor belts (10, 11) has a first supply belt (2) and a second supply belt (3) which cooperates with it. The sheet is gripped and transported between these two belts. A laying out belt (7) driven by a first inverting roller (9) forms a conveyor belt (10) for the printed product with the first feed belt. A second laying out belt (6) driven by a second inverting roller (8) forms a second printed product conveyor (11) with the second supply belt. A rotating sheet inverting device (12) inverts the printed products from the first or second laying out belt.

Abstract (de)

Eine Umlenkvorrichtung (1) zum Umlenken von in einem Strom transportierten Bogen (4) in mindestens eine von zwei Auslegebahnen (10, 11) umfaßt ein erstes Zuführband (2), das mit einem zweiten Zuführband (3) in einer Weise zusammenwirkt, daß zwischen den beiden Zuführbändern (2, 3) Druckprodukte (4) gehalten und transportiert werden. Ein drehbares Umlenkelement (12) lenkt die Druckprodukte (4) in eine erste oder eine zweite Auslegebahn (10, 11). Ein erstes Auslegeband (7) wird um eine erste Umlenkwalze (9) geführt und bildet mit dem ersten Zuführband (2) eine erste Auslegebahn (10). Ein zweites Auslegeband (6) wird um eine bezüglich der ersten Umlenkwalze (9) horizontal und vertikal versetzt angeordnete zweite Umlenkwalze (8) geführt und bildet mit dem zweiten Zuführband (3) eine zweite Auslegebahn (11) für die Druckprodukte (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/58 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/651 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029820 A2 20000823; EP 1029820 A3 20010509; DE 10001581 A1 20000824; JP 2000238951 A 20000905; US 6158736 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011110

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI