Global Patent Index - EP 1029821 A3

EP 1029821 A3 2001-02-07 - Portable cable reel

Title (en)

Portable cable reel

Title (de)

Tragbare Kabeltrommel

Title (fr)

Tambour portatif de câble

Publication

EP 1029821 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00103175 A

Priority

DE 29902526 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029821A2] The portable cable supply system has a pair of cable drums (1) that are mounted on a common frame (4). The frame is constructed of two identical units that are fixed together by tubular elements (3). Each of the drums has a horizontal spindle onto which the drums are fixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/40 (2013.01); B65H 75/4468 (2013.01); B65H 2701/534 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902526 U1 20000706; EP 1029821 A2 20000823; EP 1029821 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021104

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT FR GB NL

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010728

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI