Global patent index - EP 1029930 A1

EP 1029930 A1 2000-08-23 - Process for tanning

Title (en)

Process for tanning

Title (de)

Gerbverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de tannage

Publication

EP 1029930 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125142 A

Priority

DE 19906190 A

Abstract (en)

In a process for tanning skins with a liquor containing a dialdehyde as tanning agent, the pH of the liquor is increased from 2.5-4.0 initially to 5.5 or more. An Independent claim is also included for a composition comprising a dialdehyde and optionally a modified dialdehyde for use in this process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Gerben von Häuten, bei dem eine Haut mit einer Gerbflotte behandelt wird, die einen Dialdehyd als Gerbstoff aufweist, wobei der pH-Wert der Gerbflotte von anfänglich 2,5 bis 4,0 auf 5,5 oder mehr erhöht wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 3/16; C14C 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906190 A1 20000817; AT 253648 T 20031115; EP 1029930 A1 20000823; EP 1029930 B1 20031105

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-02-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040205

2003-12-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2003-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI