Global Patent Index - EP 1029934 A1

EP 1029934 A1 2000-08-23 - Master alloy for grain refinement of aluminium alloys

Title (en)

Master alloy for grain refinement of aluminium alloys

Title (de)

Vorlegierung zur Kornfeinung von Aluminium-Legierungen

Title (fr)

Alliage-mère pour l'affinage de grain d'alliages en aluminium

Publication

EP 1029934 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102953 A

Priority

NO 990813 A

Abstract (en)

A master alloy for grain refinement of aluminium alloys contains nucleating additives of Ti and B, in addition to unavoidable impurities. The content of Ti is 0.15 - 1.45 wt%, the content of B is 0.05 - 0.9 wt% and the Ti/B ratio is between 1.7 and 2.7. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0601972 A1 19940615 - RHEINFELDEN ALUMINIUM GMBH [DE]
  • [A] GB 1333957 A 19731017 - GRAENGES ALUMINIUM AB
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199248, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M26, AN 1992-396403, XP002139115
  • [X] L.ARNBERG ET AL: "Grain Refinement of Aluminium Part 1", METALS TECHNOLOGY, vol. 9, no. 1, 1982, London, pages 1 - 6, XP000910316
  • [PX] T.SAGSTAD ET AL: "Hydloy-a new alloy and method for grain refining aluminium, Proc Light Metals 1999, San Diago, 28 Feb - 4 Mar 1999", THE MINERALS, METALS & MATERIALS SOCIETY, WARRANDALE, PA, XP000910446
  • [PX] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 131, no. 10, 6 September 1999, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 133024, SPITTLE, J. A. ET AL: "The grain refinement of Al7Si alloys with boron containing refiners" XP002139114 & LIGHT MET. (WARRENDALE, PA.) (1999) 673-677, 28 February 1999 (1999-02-28) - 4 March 1999 (1999-03-04)LIGHT MET. (WARRENDALE, PA.) (1999) 673-6771999022819990304

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029934 A1 20000823; JP 2000265231 A 20000926; NO 990813 A 20000821; NO 990813 D0 19990219

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020108

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDELKO AS

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI