Global Patent Index - EP 1029936 A1

EP 1029936 A1 2000-08-23 - Zinc alloy for production of high quality pieces

Title (en)

Zinc alloy for production of high quality pieces

Title (de)

Zinklegierung zur Hestellung von Teilen hoher Qualität

Title (fr)

Alliage de zinc permettant la réalisation de pièces de haute qualité

Publication

EP 1029936 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403171 A

Priority

FR 9815904 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2787470A1] Zinc-aluminum-copper-magnesium alloy, has a relatively high copper content and relatively low aluminum and magnesium content. A novel zinc alloy has the composition (by wt.) 1.8-2.2% Al, 1.5-3.9% Cu, 0.02-0.06% Mg, balance Zn and impurities. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a method of producing parts by hot chamber pressure die casting of the above alloy; and (ii) parts produced by hot chamber pressure die casting of the above alloy.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un alliage de zinc comprenant en pourcentages massiques : Al : 1.8-2.2%, Cu : 1.5-3.9%, Mg : 0.02-0.06 % le reste étant constitué de zinc, avec les impuretés usuelles inévitablement présentes dans les métaux précités. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 18/02; C22C 18/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/04 (2006.01); C22C 18/02 (2006.01); C22C 18/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 18/04 (2013.01); B22D 17/04 (2013.01); C22C 18/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2787470 A1 20000623; FR 2787470 B1 20020125; DE 69906245 D1 20030430; EP 1029936 A1 20000823; EP 1029936 B1 20030326

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-06-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906245 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALEUROP S.A.

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI