Global patent index - EP 1029950 A2

EP 1029950 A2 2000-08-23 - Strip treating apparatus

Title (en)

Strip treating apparatus

Title (de)

Bandbehandlungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le traitement d'une bande

Publication

EP 1029950 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202742 A

Priority

  • EP 95918766 A
  • JP 13497094 A
  • JP 15660394 A
  • JP 5332595 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an apparatus for treating a strip such as a steel strip. The first object is to provide an electrode opening and closing mechanism having a simple construction. The second object is to uniform the flow of a solution around the electrode. The third object is to prevent causing irregularities in the treatment, caused by the variation of surface level of the solution between the electrodes. To attain the first object, one of the mutually facing electrodes is stationarily secured, and there is provided an opening and closing mechanism for moving the other electrode. To attain the second object, stabilizing members for solution flow are provided on the electrodes, a fluid-storing room is formed between the stabilizing member for solution flow and the electrode, and a slit-shaped hole for uniformly flowing the solution between the electrodes from the fluid-storing room, is formed at right angles to the travelling direction of the strip. To attain the third object, a bus bar has at its portion for suspending the electrode a bent-shaped portion so that the electrode is always immersed into the treating solution. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 7/06; C25F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 7/06 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 7/0614 (2013.01); C25F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029951 A2 20000823; EP 1029951 A3 20001206; EP 1029951 B1 20040107; AU 2455795 A 19951218; AU 697938 B2 19981022; CA 2191225 A1 19951130; CA 2191225 C 20031104; CN 1122121 C 20030924; CN 1148873 A 19970430; CN 1276132 C 20060920; CN 1515704 A 20040728; DE 69528458 D1 20021107; DE 69528458 T2 20030605; DE 69532421 D1 20040212; DE 69532421 T2 20041111; DE 69532422 D1 20040212; DE 69532422 T2 20041202; EP 0765953 A1 19970402; EP 0765953 A4 19970423; EP 0765953 B1 20021002; EP 1029950 A2 20000823; EP 1029950 A3 20001206; EP 1029950 B1 20040107; ES 2210968 T3 20040701; ES 2214810 T3 20040916; WO 9532322 A1 19951130

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080522

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOYO KOHAN CO. LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2210968

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69532421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0765953

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 765953

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL