Global patent index - EP 1029958 A1

EP 1029958 A1 2000-08-23 - Driving apparatus for flyer and bobbin spindles, in particular for preparation spinning frames processing long fibres

Title (en)

Driving apparatus for flyer and bobbin spindles, in particular for preparation spinning frames processing long fibres

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für Flügel und Vorgarnspindel, insbesondere für lange Faser verarbeitende Vorspinnmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande des ailettes et des bobines, en particulier pour banc à broches pour fibres longues

Publication

EP 1029958 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440046 A

Priority

FR 9902042 A

Abstract (en)

The control system for a roving frame, with groups of flyers and groups of bobbins, has at least three flyers and bobbins in each group with common drive belts round them powered by motors with drive belts. Two groups of flyers and bobbins are not linked by the common linking belts. A mechanical and/or electronic unit (11) synchronizes the rotary speeds of the flyers (2) and bobbins (4) in each section (1,3). The synchronizing unit (11) is a belt (12) linking the flyer sections (1) and a longitudinal connecting shaft (13) between the ends of the axes of the drive motors (6) for each bobbin section (3). A tensioner can be at the synchronizing belt (9) between flyer sections (1), and at the linkage belt between bobbin sections (3). An additional linkage belt can be between the bobbin sections (3) for synchronizing. The synchronizing unit (11) can also be two belts linking the flyer and bobbin sections (1,3) between themselves, with belt tensioners. The synchronizing between the motors (5,6) can be through two connecting shafts between their axes to drive the flyer and bobbin sections (1,3). The synchronizing shafts are between the return angles at the motor axes.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de commande des ailettes et des bobines, en particulier pour banc à broches pour fibres longues, comportant des sections (1) d'ailettes (2) et des sections (3) de bobines (4), ces sections étant reliées à un dispositif de commande, chaque section (1) d'ailettes (2) et chaque section (3) de bobines (4) étant pourvues d'un moyen d'entraînement individuel (5, respectivement 6) sous forme de moteurs individuels. Dispositif de commande caractérisé en ce que les ailettes (2) et les bobines (4) de chaque groupe sont au moins par trois et sont reliées entre-elles par l'intermédiaire de courroies (9 et 10) respectives et en ce que chaque moteur individuel (5 ou 6) entraîne, par l'intermédiaire de deux courroies d'entraînement (7, respectivement 8), deux groupes contigus d'ailettes (2), respectivement de bobines (4), non reliés entre eux par leurs courroies de liaison respectives (9 et 10). L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine de l'industrie textile, en particulier des bancs à broches pour fibres longues. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/241

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/241 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/241 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029958 A1 20000823; EP 1029958 B1 20030502; DE 60002382 D1 20030605; FR 2789700 A1 20000818; FR 2789700 B1 20010323

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-08-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60002382

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-02-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DRIVING APPARATUS FOR FLYER AND BOBBIN SPINDLES, IN PARTICULAR FOR A FLYER ROVERPROCESSING LONG STAPLE FIBRES

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI