Global Patent Index - EP 1029962 A1

EP 1029962 A1 2000-08-23 - Method for optimizing the working cycle of a dishwasher and a dishwasher using the method

Title (en)

Method for optimizing the working cycle of a dishwasher and a dishwasher using the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Optimierung des Arbeitszyklus einer Spülmaschine und eine dieses Verfahren gebrauchende Spülmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé d'optimisation du cycle de fonctionnement d'un lave-vaisselle et lave-vaisselle utilisant ce procédé

Publication

EP 1029962 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400424 A

Priority

FR 9901860 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure, for use with a dishwashing machine having a chamber filled with liquid from a water intake and in which a washing cycle is followed by a rinsing cycle, includes a stage in which the volume of water remaining in the bottom of the chamber at the end of the washing cycle is measured.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé d'optimisation du cycle de fonctionnement d'un appareil électroménager de type lave-vaisselle ou lave-linge. Ce procédé comprend une étape d'évaluation de la quantité d'eau restante en fond de cuve, en fin de lavage de manière à optimiser le cycle de rinçage. L'invention concerne également un appareil électroménager utilisant ce procédé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 35/00; A47L 15/00; A47L 15/46; D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/00 (2006.01); A47L 15/46 (2006.01); D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4244 (2013.01); A47L 15/0026 (2013.01); D06F 35/006 (2013.01); D06F 39/004 (2013.01); A47L 15/4217 (2013.01); A47L 2401/09 (2013.01); A47L 2501/30 (2013.01); D06F 2202/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029962 A1 20000823; EP 1029962 B1 20050817; DE 60021930 D1 20050922; DE 60021930 T2 20060608; ES 2245926 T3 20060201; FR 2789568 A1 20000818; FR 2789568 B1 20010504

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160215

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2016-03-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2245926

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-11-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051107

2005-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60021930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030227

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI