Global patent index - EP 1029963 A2

EP 1029963 A2 2000-08-23 - Washing machine

Title (en)

Washing machine

Title (de)

Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à laver

Publication

EP 1029963 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123353 A

Priority

IT MI990305 A

Abstract (en)

A washing machine comprises a tub (10) having a substantially cylindrical shape, containing a rotary perforated drum, a motor unit (60), control, drive, regulation devices (14, 22, 24) electrically interconnected through the wiring harness (20) and dampening means (52), wherein said tub is obtained from plastic material in one or several parts, and wherein one or more of said devices (14, 22, 24) and/or wiring harness (20), motor unit (60) and dampening control means (52) are fixed at least along the side surface of the tub (10) provided with projections, extensions or brackets (12, 26, 50, 61, 61'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/206 (2013.01); D06F 37/26 (2013.01); D06F 37/262 (2013.01); D06F 37/263 (2013.01); D06F 37/268 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029963 A2 20000823; EP 1029963 A3 20001108; IT 1308702 B1 20020110; IT MI990305 A1 20000816; TR 9903164 A2 20000921

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020419

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI