Global Patent Index - EP 1029965 A1

EP 1029965 A1 2000-08-23 - Water dispenser for washing machine

Title (en)

Water dispenser for washing machine

Title (de)

Wasserverteiler für Waschmachine

Title (fr)

Distributeur d'eau pour machine à laver

Publication

EP 1029965 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420025 A

Priority

FR 9902195 A

Abstract (en)

The distributor (7), containing a rotary component to direct the water selectively from an intake (10) to different outlets (13) leading to holders (6) containing various washing products, has an adjacent recirculating unit (8) with a water intake (19) connected to the drum chamber (1), a first outlet (15) going to the chamber, and a second outlet (16) leading to a waste pipe (5).

Abstract (fr)

Le distributeur d'eau (7) est destiné notamment aux lave-linge. Il comprend un organe rotatif, tel que disque obturateur, qui dirige sélectivement de l'eau, admise par au moins une entrée d'eau (10, 12), vers des sorties (13) dirigées respectivement vers des bacs (6) remplis de produits de lavage. Au distributeur (7) est associé un bloc de recirculation (8) qui comporte une entrée d'eau (19) en provenance de la cuve (1) de la machine à laver, une première sortie (15) dirigée vers la cuve (1) pour le recyclage de l'eau, et une deuxième sortie (16) prolongée par un conduit de vidange (5), ainsi qu'un obturateur mobile apte à obturer l'une ou l'autre des deux sorties (15, 16). Des moyens d'actionnement motorisés sont prévus pour commander le déplacement du disque obturateur du distributeur (7), et commander aussi l'obturateur mobile du bloc de recirculation (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/02; D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/083 (2013.01); D06F 39/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029965 A1 20000823; FR 2790013 A1 20000825; FR 2790013 B1 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021217

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI