Global Patent Index - EP 1029970 A2

EP 1029970 A2 2000-08-23 - Ironing board

Title (en)

Ironing board

Title (de)

Bügeltisch

Title (fr)

Planche à repasser

Publication

EP 1029970 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124307 A

Priority

DE 19906238 A

Abstract (en)

The height adjuster is located close to the intersection point (15) of the two intersecting scissor arm units (12,13). The height adjuster comprises an insertion element mounted on an arm unit (13). The element can be fixed to the other scissor arm unit (12) to create different angle positions between the units.

Abstract (de)

Bügeltisch mit einem Standgestell umfassend zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundene Scherenarmeinheiten, die an ihrem oberen Ende eine Bügelfläche tragen und mit einer Einrichtung mittels derer die Höhe der Bügelfläche gegenüber einem Untergrund durch Verändern der Winkelstellung der beiden Scherenarmeinheiten zueinander verstellbar ist, wobei die Einrichtung zur Höhenverstellung der Bügelfläche (11) in der Nähe des Kreuzungspunkts (15) der beiden sich kreuzenden Scherenarmeinheiten (12, 13) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906238 A1 20000817; EP 1029970 A2 20000823; EP 1029970 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI