Global Patent Index - EP 1029976 A1

EP 1029976 A1 2000-08-23 - Roller

Title (en)

Roller

Title (de)

Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau

Publication

EP 1029976 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103084 A

Priority

EP 99103084 A

Abstract (en)

The roller (1) for use with web material, such as of paper, has a heating system using a medium, and especially steam, fed into the roller and distributed round its circumference to give a heated roller surface. The steam is carried by axial channels (8) along the roller length, which terminate in a common ring-shaped condensation collection zone (12,13) with at least one condensation riser to an axial condensation exhaust channel (16). The condensation riser has a jet to inject steam into it to carry the condensation away. The injector jet is aligned at an acute angle against the condensation riser, to give an axial movement component on the injection line. The injector jet has a controlled position setting at the steam feed line. There are fewer condensation risers than condensation channels (8), using 1-4 risers at a condensation collection zone. The roller (1) has a roller body with a projecting journal at least at one end. The end sides of the roller body are covered by thermal insulation covers (5,6), screwed into place.

Abstract (de)

Eine Walze (1) zum Einsatz bei in spannbaren Bahnen zu verarbeitenden Werkstoffen, wie etwa in der Papierindustrie, wobei die Walze mit einem Heizmedium, insbesondere Wasserdampf, beaufschlagbar ist, das in die Walze einleitbar und in über den Walzenumfang verteilt angeordneten, im wesentlichen axialen Kanälen (8) über die Walzenerstreckung transportierbar ist, soll so ausgebildet werden, daß die Kondensatabfuhr aus den umfangreichen Heizkanälen verbessert wird. Dazu wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Kanäle zumindest einen Ends in einen gemeinsamen, im wesentlichen ringförmigen Kondensatsammelraum (10 bis 13) münden, von dem sich zumindest ein Kondensatsteiger (15) zu einem axialen Kondensatabführungskanal (16) erstreckt, wobei dem Kondensatsteiger eine Injektordüse (17) zur Einleitung von Schlupfdampf in den Kondensatsteiger zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/10; D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0266 (2013.01); D21F 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029976 A1 20000823; EP 1029976 B1 20020724; AT 221154 T 20020815

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FI FR GB IT SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221154 T 20020815

2002-07-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HELLENTHAL, LUDWIG

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FI FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT FI FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI