Global Patent Index - EP 1029985 A2

EP 1029985 A2 2000-08-23 - Impact-resistant and energy-absorbing safety post

Title (en)

Impact-resistant and energy-absorbing safety post

Title (de)

Schlagfeste und aufprallenergieabsorbierende Sicherheitspfosten

Title (fr)

Poteau de sécurité résistant aux chocs et absorbant l'énergie

Publication

EP 1029985 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200494 A

Priority

BE 9900099 A

Abstract (en)

A safety post (10) is described to safeguard objects from impact by moving objects, the post having a double tilting action comprising a first elastic impact-absorbing tilting action to reduce damage to both post and object, followed by a second rigid action to arrest the moving object. An anchor plate (2) for anchoring the post to a foundation surface is provided, the anchor plate (2) having two major surfaces, the first major surface being provided for being placed in contact with the foundation surface at which time the second major surface is remote from the foundation surface. The post includes a tiltable rigid housing (4) which extends from a position abutting or adjacent to the second major surface of the anchor plate as well as a an energy absorbing mechanism located entirely within the outer envelope of the housing (4), the energy absorbing mechanism comprising one or more resilient elements which are deformed when the post is tilted by the impact of the moving object. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 9/017 (2006.01); E01F 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/028 (2013.01); E01F 9/629 (2016.02); E01F 9/681 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029985 A2 20000823; EP 1029985 A3 20020710; BE 1013952 A3 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030111

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01F 9/017 A, 7E 01F 9/011 B, 7E 01F 13/02 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI