Global patent index - EP 1029986 A2

EP 1029986 A2 2000-08-23 - Method of building a tunnel

Title (en)

Method of building a tunnel

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Tunnels

Title (fr)

Procédé de construction d'un tunnel

Publication

EP 1029986 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200487 A

Priority

  • NL 1011291 A
  • NL 1011327 A
  • NL 1011741 A
  • NL 1011886 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is concerned with a method for laying a tunnel, wherein prefabricated tunnel segments are placed in a liquid filled channel in the ground such that they float, said floating tunnel segments are mutually coupled and subsequently lowered onto the bottom of said channel. According to a preferred embodiment, the lowering is carried out such that at least one of the mutually coupled tunnel segments is already lowered, while at least another of said mutually coupled tunnel segments still floats. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/05; E02D 29/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 25/00 (2006.01); E02D 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 25/00 (2013.01); E02D 29/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029986 A2 20000823; EP 1029986 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010915

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 02D 25/00 A, 7E 02D 29/07 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI