Global Patent Index - EP 1029988 A2

EP 1029988 A2 2000-08-23 - Support device for sanitary appliances

Title (en)

Support device for sanitary appliances

Title (de)

Tragvorrinchtung für sanitäre Einrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour appareils sanitaires

Publication

EP 1029988 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811058 A

Priority

DE 29902855 U

Abstract (en)

The device has a profile frame (9) provided with both horizontal and vertical rods (10,11). The outer skin is covered with plaster or tiles and a free space (35) is left in which a furniture section (6) can extend up to the depth of the profile frame. The frame has hollow profile rods (10,11) having attachment grooves (12). Inbuilt sections (17) of the furniture are held in a releasable fashion in these grooves.

Abstract (de)

Die Tragvorrichtung weist Profilgerüst (9) auf, das boden- und wandseitig abgestützt oder freistehend ist und horizontale als auch vertikale Profilstangen (10, 11) besitzt. In einen nicht durch Sanitärkörper besetzten freien Raum (35) ist ein Möbelstück (6 bis 6''') eingebaut. Das Profilgerüst (9) besitzt Hohlprofilstangen (10, 11) mit aussenseitig angeordneten und in Längsrichtung verlaufenden Befestigungsnuten. Zur Montage des Möbelstücks (6 bis 6''') ist ein Einbaurahmen (17) vorgesehen, der lösbar in Befestigungsnuten (12) zweier im Abstand zueinander angeordneten, vertikalen Hohlprofilstangen (10) befestigt ist. Das Möbelstück (6 bis 6''') ist am Einbaurahmen (17) lösbar befestigt. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); E03C 1/01 (2006.01); E04F 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2013.01); E03C 1/01 (2013.01); E04F 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902855 U1 19990506; AT 293190 T 20050415; DK 1029988 T3 20050815; EP 1029988 A2 20000823; EP 1029988 A3 20020731; EP 1029988 B1 20050413; HK 1028797 A1 20050603

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080601

2006-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051117

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-07-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060116

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-08-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-06-03 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1028797

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911905

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB LI NL

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB LI NL

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI