Global Patent Index - EP 1029993 A2

EP 1029993 A2 2000-08-23 - Anchoring rail with markings visible within the rail

Title (en)

Anchoring rail with markings visible within the rail

Title (de)

Ankerschiene mit schieneninnenseitig einsehbarer Kennzeichnung

Title (fr)

Rail d'ancrage avec marquage visible dans le rail

Publication

EP 1029993 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250041 A

Priority

DE 29903167 U

Abstract (en)

A support rail (2) for construction applications has a c-shaped cross section and has its base bored with fitting holes into which are pressed mounting bolts. The bolts have profiled shanks which provide a press-fit into the holes and have identifying marks (8), e.g. manufacturer's marks, applied to the heads. The marks are protected inside an outer raised rim (10) to allow the bolts to be pressed into the holes without damaging the markings.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Ankerschiene (1) für die Bautechnik mit einem, einen einsehbaren Schieneninnenraum (7) aufweisenden Schienenteil (2) und in Abständen voneinander an den Schienenteil (2) angebrachten Ankern (3), wobei die Anker (3) einen Ankerfuß (4) und einen gegenüber dem Ankerfuß (4) querschnittskleineren Ankerschaft (5) aufweisen und an dem Schienenteil (2) in, in diesem angebrachten Löchern (6) diese durchgreifend fixiert sind, wobei der Ankerfuß (4) schieneninnenseitig an dem Schienenteil (2) anliegt und eine schieneninnenseitig einsehbare Kennzeichnung (8) trägt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01); G09F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4107 (2013.01); G09F 7/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903167 U1 19990527; EP 1029993 A2 20000823; EP 1029993 A3 20020213

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI