Global Patent Index - EP 1029994 A2

EP 1029994 A2 2000-08-23 - Anchoring rail for building construction with anchors secured to rail by collars obtained by scraping

Title (en)

Anchoring rail for building construction with anchors secured to rail by collars obtained by scraping

Title (de)

Ankerschiene für die Bautechnik mit mittels Abstreifkragen fixierten Ankern

Title (fr)

Rail d'ancrage pour le bâtiment avec ancrages fixés sur le rail par des collerettes obtenues par râclage

Publication

EP 1029994 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250042 A

Priority

DE 19907475 A

Abstract (en)

The holder mechanism designed to prevent the anchor being accidentally detached from the rail (2) comprises a flange (7) formed from the anchor shaft (5). The anchor comprises a rail with spaced apart anchors mounted in holes, each anchor having a foot (4) and a shaft with a reduced diameter compared with the foot. The anchor shaft includes a holder mechanism in contact with the outside of the rail, whilst the foot is in contact with the inside of the rail. An Independent claim is also included for a method of making the anchor rail.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Ankerschiene (1) für die Bautechnik mit einem Schienenteil (2) und in Abständen voneinander an dem Schienenteil (2) angebrachten Ankern (3), wobei die Anker (3) einen Ankerfuß (4) und einen gegenüber dem Ankerfuß (4) querschnittskleineren Ankerschaft (5) aufweisen, wobei die Anker (3) an dem Schienenteil (2) in in dem Schienenteil (2) angebrachten Löchern (6) diese durchgreifend fixiert sind, wobei der Ankerfuß (4) schieneninnenseitig an dem Schienenteil (2) anliegt und wobei der Ankerschaft (5) eine schienenaußenseitig an dem Schienenteil (2) anliegende Verliersicherung aufweist. Sie ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Verliersicherung aus einem aus dem Ankerschaft (5) ausgebildeten Abstreifkragen (7) gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4107 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029994 A2 20000823; EP 1029994 A3 20020213; DE 19907475 C1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI