Global Patent Index - EP 1029996 A2

EP 1029996 A2 2000-08-23 - Mobile partition with closure profile

Title (en)

Mobile partition with closure profile

Title (de)

Mobile Trennwand mit Abschlussprofil

Title (fr)

Cloison mobile avec profilé d'obturation

Publication

EP 1029996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103047 A

Priority

DE 19907242 A

Abstract (en)

One of the border profile sections includes a sliding part movable in a sideways direction by a drive unit, the free vertical side of this part including a fixture for activating the coupling piece (13) used to activate the lifting device (12) for the border profile (8). Each wall element frame has mounted in it a border profile, a pivotable lifting device mechanically connected to the profile, and a horizontally movable coupling piece mechanically connected to the lifting device. Once the adjacent wall elements have been slid together, the coupling pieces can be moved using a drive unit in an adjacent wall element, and the border profiles can be moved in a vertical direction. The wall comprises a number of wall elements suspended from a rail, each comprising a frame and at least one panel. At least one vertically movable border profile is present, the movement of the profile being achieved using a lifting device activated by a coupling piece.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine mobile Trennwand (1) mit mehreren an einer Laufschiene aufgehängten Wandelementen (2), die jeweils aus einem Rahmen (3) und aus zumindest einer Platte (4) bestehen, mit mindestens einem Abschlußprofil (8), das vertikal bewegbar und anpreßbar ist, und mit mindestens einem die Bewegung des Abschlußprofiles (8) bewirkenden Huborgan (12), das durch ein horizontal wirkendes Koppelelement (13) aktivierbar ist. Um eine derartige mobile Trennwand so zu gestalten, daß unter Vermeidung eines Spaltes zu einer stationären Wand eine thermische Abdichtung aller Wandelemente realisierbar und ein Manipulationsschutz zwischen benachbarten Wandelementen gewährleistet ist, weist ein Abschlußelement (30) einen seitlich ausfahrbaren Schieber (31) auf, der durch eine Antriebseinheit verfahrbar ist und der an seiner freien vertikalen Seite (32) ein Einrichtung (33) zur Aktivierung der Koppelelemente (13) aufweist und ist im Rahmen (3) jedes Wandelementes (2) mindestens ein Abschlußprofil (8), ein mit dem Abschlußprofil (8) mechanisch verbundenes und schwenkbar gelagertes Huborgan (12), und ein horizontal bewegbares mit dem Huborgan (12) mechanisch verbundenes Koppelelement (13) angeordnet, wobei nach dem Zusammenschieben benachbarter Wandelemente (2) die Koppelelemente (13) mittels der Antriebseinheit in benachbarte Wandelemente (2) verschiebbar und die Abschlußprofile (8) vertikal verfahrbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/827 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7468 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029996 A2 20000823; EP 1029996 A3 20020821; DE 19907242 A1 20000914; DE 19907242 B4 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI