Global Patent Index - EP 1029997 A2

EP 1029997 A2 2000-08-23 - Mobile partition with closure profile

Title (en)

Mobile partition with closure profile

Title (de)

Mobile Trennwand mit Abschlussprofil

Title (fr)

Cloison mobile avec profilé d'obturation

Publication

EP 1029997 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103049 A

Priority

DE 19907232 A

Abstract (en)

A pivotable lifting device (12) mechanically connected to the border profile (8), and a horizontally movable coupling piece (13) mechanically connected to the lifting device are mounted in the frame for each wall element. Once the adjacent wall elements have been slid together, the coupling pieces can be moved using a drive unit in an adjacent wall element, and the border profiles can be moved in a vertical direction. The wall comprises a number of wall elements suspended from a rail, each comprising a frame and at least one panel. At least one vertically movable border profile is present, the movement of the profile being achieved using a lifting device activated by a coupling piece. The border profiles can be clamped between the floor and ceiling.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine mobile Trennwand (1) mit mehreren an einer Laufschiene aufgehängten Wandelementen (2), die jeweils aus einem Rahmen (3) und aus zumindest einer Platte (4) bestehen, mit mindestens einem Abschlußprofil (8), das vertikal bewegbar und anpreßbar ist, und mit mindestens einem die Bewegung des Abschlußprofiles (8) bewirkenden Huborgan (12), das durch ein horizontal wirkendes Koppelelement (13) aktivierbar ist. Um eine derartige mobile Trennwand so zu gestalten, daß eine thermische Abdichtung aller Wandelemente (2) realisierbar und ein Manipulationsschutz zwischen benachbarten Wandelementen (2) gewährleistet ist, sind die Abschlußprofile (8) der Wandelemente (2) zwischen Boden (9) und Decke (7) verspannbar und die Koppelelemente (13) der Wandelemente (2) untereinander wirkverbindbar und verschiebbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/827 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7468 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029997 A2 20000823; EP 1029997 A3 20020821; DE 19907232 A1 20000914; DE 19907232 B4 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI