Global Patent Index - EP 1030001 A3

EP 1030001 A3 2001-05-09 - Duct system for prestressing steel and method of making the same

Title (en)

Duct system for prestressing steel and method of making the same

Title (de)

Hüllrohrsystem für Vorspannstähle in Spannbeton und Herstellungsverfahren hierfür

Title (fr)

Système de gaines pour acier de précontraint et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1030001 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104996 A

Priority

DE 19906370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030001A2] The cover pipe system consisting of a number of cover pipes (1) provided (for purposes of forming joints) with inner and outer screwed elements (2, 3) at their ends comprises a screwed connection which is installed into a bore in a cover pipe, is welded to the latter, and serves for ventilation and/or injection of an injection liquid. Also claimed is a method for producing such cover pipe systems. The method involves production of bores at specified points of the cover pipe system for screwed connections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030001 A2 20000823; EP 1030001 A3 20010509; DE 19906370 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI