Global Patent Index - EP 1030005 A2

EP 1030005 A2 2000-08-23 - Ceiling and construction process thereof

Title (en)

Ceiling and construction process thereof

Title (de)

Deckenanordnung, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Plafond et procédé pour sa construction

Publication

EP 1030005 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101310 A

Priority

DE 29902634 U

Abstract (en)

The ceiling arrangement comprises several flat building elements (12, 14) which in an essentially vertical orientation are joined with one another by means of coupling elements (26, 42) in such a way that they form at least one rigid frame. Such a frame serves as a part of the load carrying structure of the ceiling arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um eine Deckenanordnung für Messe- und Präsentationsstände, Ladenbausysteme, Büro-Einbauten und dgl.. Diese Anordnung hat eine Mehrzahl flacher Bauelemente (12, 14), welche im montierten Zustand eine im wesentlichen vertikale Lage einnehmen und an deren im montierten Zustand oberen und unteren Kante jeweils ein Verstärkungselement (16) befestigt ist, an dem im Bereich mindestens eines Endes mindestens ein Eingriffselement (20) befestigt ist. Ferner ist mindestens ein Profilstab (26) zur Verbindung dieser flachen Bautelemente (12, 14) vorgesehen, wobei an mindestens einem Ende dieses Profilstabs (26) ein Aufnahmeelement (42; 42A) lösbar befestigt ist, das mit Ausnehmungen (48) versehen ist. Diese dienen zur Aufnahme von Eingriffselementen (20) der flachen Bauelemente (12, 14), welche diesem Profilstab (26) zugeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/10 (2006.01); E04B 9/32 (2006.01); E04B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/34 (2013.01); A47F 5/10 (2013.01); E04B 9/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902634 U1 20000629; EP 1030005 A2 20000823; EP 1030005 A3 20010620

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050204

2002-03-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04H 1/12 A, 7E 04B 9/34 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI