Global patent index - EP 1030007 A1

EP 1030007 A1 2000-08-23 - Striker for a motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Striker for a motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Schliessblech für ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss

Title (fr)

Gâche pour serrure de portière de vehicule automobile

Publication

EP 1030007 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400362 A

Priority

FR 9902076 A

Abstract (en)

the keeper for a motor vehicle door lock has a u-shaped frame with parallel branches (10,12) connected by a base (11) and a cross pin (12) to slide in a cut out in the bolt. The pin has a metallic tube fixed to the branches. The pin carries a sleeve of plastic to dampen closure shocks. The plastics sleeve does not cover the part of the pin which is engaged by the bolt when the lock is closed.

Abstract (fr)

La gâche est constituée d'une plaquette repliée de manière à former un U présentant deux branches (10, 12) parallèles raccordées par un fond (11) et d'un pion (2), reliant les extrémités libres des branches (10, 12) du U, destiné à glisser dans une échancrure du pêne de la serrure. Le pion (2) est constitué par une âme métallique solidarisée avec lesdites branches (10, 12) et portant une bague en matière plastique d'épaisseur e déterminée de manière à amortir les bruits de fermeture de la portière du véhicule. Le diamètre externe dudit pion (2) est égal à la largeur de l'échancrure du pêne dans laquelle ledit pion est inséré quand la portière est fermée. Selon l'invention, la bague en matière plastique (36) d'épaisseur e ne recouvre qu'une zone Z de l'âme réduite à celle dans laquelle le pêne est susceptible de coopérer avec le pion (2) de la gâche (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02; E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/045 (2013.01); E05B 77/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030007 A1 20000823; FR 2790025 A1 20000825; FR 2790025 B1 20010525

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEBLOCK, LUC

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANNIER, JEAN

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: D'ALMEIDA, JOSE

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI