Global Patent Index - EP 1030009 A2

EP 1030009 A2 2000-08-23 - Vehicle doorlock or similar

Title (en)

Vehicle doorlock or similar

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Serrure de véhicule automobile, ou similaire

Publication

EP 1030009 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102922 A

Priority

DE 19906997 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a lock catch with a locking pawl (5) that holds the catch in the closed position and a motorized opening drive with a drive motor and a reduction gear for engaging a locking pawl lever to raise the pawl to release the lock catch. The reduction gear (8) or pawl lever (9) has an associated raising spring (11) acting in the pawl lifting direction that is tensioned when the opening drive (6) returns to the closed position and that supports the pre-opening motion of the pawl.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloß mit einer Schloßfalle (4) und einer die Schloßfalle (4) in Schließstellung (Hauptrast (4a) und ggf. Vorrast (4b)) haltenden Sperrklinke (5) und mit einem motorischen Öffnungsantrieb (6), wobei der motorische Öffnungsantrieb (6) einen vorzugsweise als Elektromotor ausgeführten Antriebsmotor (7) und ein Untersetzungsgetriebe (8) aufweist, das abtriebsseitig an der Sperrklinke (5) oder einem die Sperrklinke (5) bewegenden Sperrklinkenhebel (9) o. dgl. angreift und die Sperrklinke (5) bei entsprechender Ansteuerung des Antriebsmotors (7) aushebt, so daß die Schloßfalle (4) freigegeben wird - Öffnungsstellung -. Dieses ist hinsichtlich der Öffnungskräfte dadurch optimiert, daß dem Untersetzungsgetriebe (8) oder dem Sperrklinkenhebel (9) o. dgl. eine in Ausheberichtung der Sperrklinke (5) wirkende Aushebefeder (11) zugeordnet ist, daß die Aushebefeder (11) bei Rücklauf des Öffnungsantriebs (6) von der Öffnungsstellung in die Schließstellung gespannt wird und daß die Aushebefeder (11) bei Vorlauf des Öffnungsantriebs (6) von der Schließstellung in die Öffnungsstellung die Vorlaufbewegung und die Aushebebewegung der Sperrklinke (5) mit ihrer Federkraft unterstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030009 A2 20000823; EP 1030009 A3 20030730; EP 1030009 B1 20050817; DE 19906997 A1 20000831; DE 19906997 C2 20010426; ES 2250032 T3 20060416; US 6371536 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010943

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250032 T3

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010943 P 20050922

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 A

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2003-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 15/04 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI