Global patent index - EP 1030010 A2

EP 1030010 A2 2000-08-23 - Electromechanical actuator

Title (en)

Electromechanical actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Stelltrieb

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1030010 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301338 A

Priority

  • EP 00301338 A
  • EP 99301911 A
  • FI 990357 A

Abstract (en)

An electromechanical actuator comprising a body element (1) and an elongate interaction means (3, 3', 3''), one of which is provided with electromagnetic means (2) and the other of which comprises ferromagnetic material or a permanent magnet. The body element and interaction means are arranged with respect to each other so that a rotational motion may be imparted to the interaction means (3, 3', 3'') by means of a created magnetic field. The interaction means (3, 3', 3'') is rotatable between two rotational positions by altering the polarity of the electromagnetic means. When in one rotational position, the interaction means (3, 3', 3'') is displaceable in a direction of its rotation axis, by the application of an external force. The interaction means is arranged to co-operate with the body element (1) in a manner such that they together define the freedom of operation of the interaction means (3, 3', 3'') in the axial direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/06; H01F 7/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/17 (2006.01); E05B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0642 (2013.01); H01F 7/17 (2013.01); E05B 21/066 (2013.01); E05B 47/0005 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030010 A2 20000823; EP 1030010 A3 20020109

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060411

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041111

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI