Global Patent Index - EP 1030012 A1

EP 1030012 A1 2000-08-23 - Motor vehicle lock with energy storing unlocking mechanism

Title (en)

Motor vehicle lock with energy storing unlocking mechanism

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugschloss mit energiespeichernder Entriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Serrure pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile, à mémorisation de décondamnation

Publication

EP 1030012 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400391 A

Priority

FR 9901823 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for a motor vehicle door has a locking lever (70) to move a releasable link (50) which can selectively transmit lever movement to the lock. A stop arm (38) selectively displacement of the link when it is in the released position. An anti-panic cam (45-49) selectively allows displacement of the link by the lever.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure comportant un levier d'ouverture extérieure (38), un levier de condamnation (70) apte à déplacer une biellette de liaison débrayable (50) entre une position embrayée dans laquelle le levier d'ouverture extérieure peut coopérer, lors de sa course d'ouverture, avec ladite biellette, pour provoquer l'ouverture de la serrure, et une position débrayée qui interdit l'ouverture de la serrure, un organe (38, 62) apte à bloquer le déplacement de ladite biellette lorsque celle-ci est dans sa position débrayée et un moyen anti-panique (45-49) intercalé entre le levier de condamnation et ladite biellette pour permettre, d'une part, le déplacement de ladite biellette par le levier de condamnation, lorsque ledit organe est au repos, et d'autre part, le déplacement du levier de condamnation vers sa position décondamnée, lorsque ledit organe est dans sa position de blocage de la biellette, l'énergie de décondamnation étant emmagasinée par le moyen anti-panique, pour déclencher automatiquement le déplacement de la biellette vers sa position embrayée dès que ledit organe revient à sa position de repos. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 77/32 (2013.01); Y10T 70/65 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030012 A1 20000823; EP 1030012 B1 20110105; DE 60045456 D1 20110217; FR 2789716 A1 20000818; FR 2789716 B1 20010629; US 6554329 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE, CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60045456

- Effective date: 20150515

2012-02-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60045456

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110416

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60045456

- Effective date: 20110217

2011-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60045456 P 20110217

2011-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2011-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI