Global Patent Index - EP 1030014 A1

EP 1030014 A1 2000-08-23 - Three-part lock for a vehicle wing

Title (en)

Three-part lock for a vehicle wing

Title (de)

Dreiteiliges Schloss für einen Kraftfahrzeugflügel

Title (fr)

Serrure en trois parties, pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1030014 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400393 A

Priority

FR 9901824 A

Abstract (en)

Lock comprises two modules; first module (M1) includes retention compartment, and section of locking/unlocking kinematic chain; second module fits on first module, includes other part of chain and overturning (C) covering second module and assembly side of first module. First and second modules and overturning are attached together with two screws or pins.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile, caractérisée par le fait qu'elle est constituée d'un premier module (M1) qui comporte un compartiment de rétention contenant les organes de rétention de la serrure, une partie de la chaîne cinématique d'ouverture et de condamnation de la serrure étant montée sur une face de montage du premier module, à l'opposé du compartiment de rétention, d'un deuxième module sur lequel est montée l'autre partie de la chaîne cinématique d'ouverture et de condamnation de la serrure, le deuxième module venant s'emboîter sur le premier module du côté de ladite face de montage, et d'un capotage (C) destiné à coiffer le deuxième module et la face de montage du premier module, l'ensemble des deux modules et du capotage étant assemblé par des moyens de liaison constitués par au moins deux goupilles ou vis épaulées qui traversent successivement une contre-plaque métallique du premier module, le corps du deuxième module et le capotage (C), l'une au moins des goupilles ou vis épaulées sert d'axe de rotation à au moins un levier de la serrure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/34 (2013.01); E05B 81/54 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030014 A1 20000823; FR 2789717 A1 20000818; FR 2789717 B1 20010629; US 6497436 B1 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI