Global Patent Index - EP 1030015 A1

EP 1030015 A1 2000-08-23 - Lock fitting of the espagnolette type or similar

Title (en)

Lock fitting of the espagnolette type or similar

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag des Typs mit Treibstangen oder ähnlichem

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone ou analogue

Publication

EP 1030015 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440045 A

Priority

FR 9901972 A

Abstract (en)

The lock fitting for a building door has a casing (2) fixed to a head strip (6) with upper and lower actuating links (4,5). The linkage is actuated by a rack with an end extending from the casing as far as the corresponding ends (7,8) of the head and co-operating with the links. A stop (11) has a flange (23) to engage the corresponding ends of the head to engage a linkage head strip (9).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone ou analogue comportant un boîtier (2) solidaire d'une têtière de boîtier (6) et au-dessus ou en-dessous duquel s'étend au moins une tringle de manoeuvre (4 ; 5) à l'arrière d'une têtière de tringle (9 ; 10), sur cette tringle de manoeuvre (4 ; 5) agissant une crémaillère comportant son extrémité venant se prolonger en dehors du boîtier (2) de manière à s'étendre au-delà des extrémités correspondantes (7 ; 8) de la têtière de boîtier (6) et coopérer, avec ladite tringle de manoeuvre (4 ; 5). Au niveau de cette extrémité (7 ; 8), la têtière de boîtier (6) est pourvue, encore, de moyens de blocage (11) d'une têtière de tringle (9 ; 10) sous forme d'un volet venant se clipper sur ladite extrémité (7, 8) de cette têtière de boîtier (6) en prolongeant cette dernière au-dessus de ladite têtière de tringle (9 ; 10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00; E05B 9/00; E05C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2013.01); E05B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030015 A1 20000823; EP 1030015 B1 20040707; DE 60011949 D1 20040812; DE 60011949 T2 20050825; ES 2223433 T3 20050301; FR 2789719 A1 20000818; FR 2789719 B1 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070214

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-02-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2223433

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60011949

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030731

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI