Global Patent Index - EP 1030017 A1

EP 1030017 A1 2000-08-23 - Espagnolette lock comprising a hook bolt with dead-locking means

Title (en)

Espagnolette lock comprising a hook bolt with dead-locking means

Title (de)

Treibstangenschloss enthaltend einen Hakenriegel mit Mitteln zur Riegelblockierung

Title (fr)

Crémone-serrure comprenant un pêne à crochet à verrouillage sécurisé

Publication

EP 1030017 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400134 A

Priority

FR 9901932 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for a building door has a drive for the slide (4) formed by a toothed rack (7) fixed to the bolt (1) and centred on its pivot axis (X-X). The toothed rack meshes with the rack (8) teeth on the slide. A lock stop has a lug (9) which can move with rotation of the bolt to a position in which the lug engages in a notch (10) formed in the slide and bias the slide into a position in which the teeth are opposed.

Abstract (fr)

Les moyens d'entraînement du chevalet (4) comprennent un secteur denté (7) solidaire du pêne (1) et centré sur l'axe de pivotement (X-X') de ce dernier, ce secteur denté (7) étant engrené avec les dents d'une crémaillère (8) solidaire du chevalet (4). Les moyens de blocage comportent un plot (9) mobile lors de la rotation du pêne (1) vers une position où ce plot (9) s'engage dans une encoche (10) pratiquée dans le chevalet (4) en exerçant sur ce dernier un effort qui déplace légèrement le chevalet (4) et provoque la mise en opposition d'une dent (11c) de la crémaillère avec une dent (12c) du secteur denté (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05B 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1875 (2013.01); E05B 63/0013 (2013.01); E05B 17/2084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030017 A1 20000823; EP 1030017 B1 20040331; DE 60009373 D1 20040506; DE 60009373 T2 20050310; ES 2218076 T3 20041116; FR 2789715 A1 20000818; FR 2789715 B1 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060120

2007-01-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060120

2006-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-02-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218076 T3

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009373 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI