Global Patent Index - EP 1030018 A1

EP 1030018 A1 2000-08-23 - Door security check

Title (en)

Door security check

Title (de)

Türfängerverschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrebâillement pour porte

Publication

EP 1030018 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890020 A

Priority

AT 25999 A

Abstract (en)

The lock contains a catch (6) lockable into position using a single snap-fit catch (11, 12) or several arranged in series, which are spring-loaded in the pushed-out position. The push rod (1) includes a control surface on one side for disengaging the snap-fit catches one after the other. The lock is used as an additional lock and is hand-operated using a multi-catch lock mechanism and push rod. The door catch slid in and out using a handle-operated nut (3) is housed in a swing-out bracket that enables the door to be opened slightly to enable letters or other documents to be passed through without the person inside needing to unlock and completely open the door.

Abstract (de)

Ein Türfängerverschluss wird mittels eines Handgriffs und über eine Schubstange (1) eines Mehrriegelschlosses betätigt. Ein durch den Handgriff gegen Federkraft (9) ausgeschobener Türfänger-Riegel (6) greift stockseitig in einen schwenkbaren Türfängerbügel ein, sodass die Tür nur auf Spaltbreite geöffnet werden kann. Der Türfänger-Riegel (6) wird gegen Federkraft (9) von einer Rastklinke (10) über ein Sperrhaken (7) in der Ausschubstellung festgehalten. Die Rastklinke (10) ist durch eine Steuerfläche auf der Schubstange (1) und eine zugeordnete Wippe (13) anhebbar bzw. absenkbar, sodass von der Sperrstellung das Mehrriegelschloss ausgehend der in weiterer Folge aktivierte Türfänger beim Öffnen des Mehrriegelschlosses aktiviert bleibt und erst beim nachfolgenden Sperren des Mehrriegelschlosses zum vollständigen Öffnen der Tür zurückgestellt ist. In einer Weiterbildung sind zwei Rastklinken (11, 12) in Serie geschaltet, sodass bei einem ersten Auf- und Zusperren bzw. Zu- und Aufsperren des Mehrriegelschlosses die Verrastung des Türfänger-Riegels von der zweiten Rastklinke (12) auf die erste Rastklinke (11) springt und der Türfänger-Riegel (6) beim nachfolgenden Sperrzyklus freigegeben ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/16; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/166 (2013.01); E05C 9/1841 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030018 A1 20000823; EP 1030018 B1 20020102; AT 407066 B 20001227; AT A25999 A 20000415; DE 50000088 D1 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150124

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150124

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150124

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000088

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000088 20020228

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI