Global patent index - EP 1030021 A2

EP 1030021 A2 2000-08-23 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 1030021 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102517 A

Priority

AT 25299 A

Abstract (en)

A bracket extending at right angles to the hinge arm (4) is formed from the base plate (3) on which the arm is mounted. The bracket is anchored to the opposite side of the base plate to the arm, which is fitted between a base plate strip and the bracket. A base plate is secured to the door frame, and the hinge arm mounted on it is pivotably connected to a hinge cup (8) in the door leaf. At least one positioning and/or locking mechanism is provided for fixing the hinge arm in different positions relative to the base plate.

Abstract (de)

Ein Scharnier zur Verankerung eines Türflügels (2) an einem Rahmen (1) eines Möbels. Das Scharnier weist eine am Rahmen (1) befestigbare Grundplatte (3) auf, an der ein Scharnierarm (4) lagert, mit dem ein am Türflügel (2) befestigbarer Scharniertopf (8) über eine Gelenkachse verbunden ist. Es sind Verstell- und/oder Fixiermittel vorgesehen ist, mittels denen der Scharnierarm (4) in verschiedenen Positionen auf der Grundplatte (3) festlegbar ist. Die Grundplatte (3) ist mit einem Bügel (15) versehen, der sich quer zum Scharnierarm (4) erstreckt und an gegenüberliegenden Seiten des Scharnierarmes (4) in der Grundplatte (3) verankert ist. Der Scharnierarm (4) ist unter den Bügel 815) eingeschoben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05D 5/08 (2013.01); E05D 7/0415 (2013.01); E05F 1/1215 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5324 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53257 (2013.01); Y10T 16/536 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

AT 1787 U1 19971125 - BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030021 A2 20000823; EP 1030021 A3 20001102; AT 409157 B 20020625; AT A25299 A 20011015; US 2002174517 A1 20021128; US 6442798 B1 20020903; US 6622343 B2 20030923

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090310

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070925

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI