Global Patent Index - EP 1030024 A2

EP 1030024 A2 2000-08-23 - Procedure and device for fabricating spacer elements for insulating glazing made of hollow profiles

Title (en)

Procedure and device for fabricating spacer elements for insulating glazing made of hollow profiles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Abstandhaltern für Isolierglas aus Hohlprofilleisten

Title (fr)

Procedure et dispositif pour la production d'espaceurs pour vitrage isolant en profilés creux

Publication

EP 1030024 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890040 A

Priority

AT 24899 A

Abstract (en)

Mitering incisions are made into the hollow strip. A hardening mass is introduced into a corner location. The corner is formed before the mass has hardened. The corner angle is maintained with clamping, during a stage of advancing the next miter cut into the bending station. An Independent claim is included for equipment carrying out the process. This includes a feed unit (4) for the strip (1) with miter incision (3) and bending location (5). A toggle-joint operated clamp (9) holds the strip. Further details of the equipment are provided.

Abstract (de)

Aus einer Hohlprofilleiste (1) wird ein Abstandhalter für Isolierglas hergestellt, indem in der Hohlprofilleiste (1) Gehrungseinschnitte (3) hergestellt werden, die so mit Gehrungseinschnitten (3) versehene Hohlprofilleiste (1) mehrfach abgewinkelt wird und im Bereich jeder der so hergestellten Ecken (11) eine die Winkellage der zu den Ecken führenden Schenkel festlegende, erhärtende Masse eingespritzt wird. Jedesmal, nachdem in eine Ecke (11) erhärtende Masse eingespritzt worden ist, wird die Hohlprofilleiste (1) unter Beibehalten des Winkels, den die zur Ecke (11) führenden Abschnitte der Hohlprofilleiste (1) miteinander einschließen, aus der Biegestelle (5) weitertransportiert, um den nächsten Gehrungseinschnitt (3) in die Biegestelle (5) zu bewegen, bevor noch die in die Ecke (11) eingespritzte, erhärtende Masse erhärtet ist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67313 (2013.01); E06B 3/67373 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030024 A2 20000823; EP 1030024 A3 20010502; AT 406889 B 20001025; AT A24899 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 3/663 A, 7E 06B 3/673 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI