Global Patent Index - EP 1030024 A3

EP 1030024 A3 2001-05-02 - Procedure and device for fabricating spacer elements for insulating glazing made of hollow profiles

Title (en)

Procedure and device for fabricating spacer elements for insulating glazing made of hollow profiles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Abstandhaltern für Isolierglas aus Hohlprofilleisten

Title (fr)

Procedure et dispositif pour la production d'espaceurs pour vitrage isolant en profilés creux

Publication

EP 1030024 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890040 A

Priority

AT 24899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1030024A2] Mitering incisions are made into the hollow strip. A hardening mass is introduced into a corner location. The corner is formed before the mass has hardened. The corner angle is maintained with clamping, during a stage of advancing the next miter cut into the bending station. An Independent claim is included for equipment carrying out the process. This includes a feed unit (4) for the strip (1) with miter incision (3) and bending location (5). A toggle-joint operated clamp (9) holds the strip. Further details of the equipment are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663; E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67313 (2013.01); E06B 3/67373 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030024 A2 20000823; EP 1030024 A3 20010502; AT 406889 B 20001025; AT A24899 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 3/663 A, 7E 06B 3/673 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI