Global Patent Index - EP 1030044 A2

EP 1030044 A2 2000-08-23 - Device for adapting the torque of an engine torque model

Title (en)

Device for adapting the torque of an engine torque model

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Drehmomentenadaption für ein Motormomentenmodell

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'adaptation du couple d'un modèle du couple de moteur

Publication

EP 1030044 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100324 A

Priority

DE 19906416 A

Abstract (en)

Connected directly to an internal combustion engine (10), a clutch (12) has a driven shaft on its drive side fitted with a torque detection sensor, including an expansion measurement strip (16). Receivers (18), fitted opposite this strip to generate without contact a corresponding signal after loading the strip in a torsion direction, receive this and transmit it as a signal (MdAntr) to a CAN bus (20).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Drehmomentadaption, bei der eine Berechnungseinheit vorgesehen ist, die aus Kennfeld- und/oder Sensoreingangsgrößen, wie der Motortemperatur, der Last oder der Motordrehzahl, und anhand eines Motormomentenmodells ein Motormoment ermittelt. Zur Verbesserung der Genauigkeit der Motormomentenbestimmung ist ein Sensor zum Erfassen eines an einer zwischen dem Verbrennungsmotor und den angetriebenen Rädern angeordneten Antriebswelle anliegenden Moments vorgesehen, wobei der Sensor ein dem Moment entsprechendes Singal für die Berechnungseinheit erzeugt und die Berechnungseinheit derart ausgebildet ist, daß das aus dem Modell resultierende Motormoment in Abhängigkeit von dem erfaßten Moment korrigierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; G01M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 3/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/0215 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1002 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); Y10T 477/679 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906416 A1 20000817; EP 1030044 A2 20000823; EP 1030044 A3 20021204; JP 2000234557 A 20000829; US 6419609 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI