Global Patent Index - EP 1030052 A1

EP 1030052 A1 2000-08-23 - High pressure fuel injection system for a direct injection internal combustion engine

Title (en)

High pressure fuel injection system for a direct injection internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Hochdruck-Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem einer direkteinspritzenden Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant sous haute pression dans un moteur à combustion interne à injection directe

Publication

EP 1030052 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402885 A

Priority

FR 9814816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2786225A1] In the direct system, fuel injected directly (3) into each individual cylinder (6) is delivered from a common rail (1) supplied from an engine-driven high-pressure pump (7). Timing and duration of each injection is controlled by an electronic management unit. Injection pressures are subject to undesirable fluctuations attributable to the cyclic operation of the injectors themselves and to the pump characteristics In one proposal, a short tube (12) of greater diameter is inserted in the feed pipe (2). For an internal pipe diameter of 3mm, the insert might have diameter 9mm and length 25mm. Alternative devices described include -: a quarter wave resonator formed by a teed stub tube or by concentric interconnected sleeves: a 3-section stub progressively reducing in diameter: an interference device offering a parallel but longer alternative fuel path: a sealed cylinder fixed over a perforated section of the feed pipe. In this last case, and in the simple enlargement, the device is opt. filled with porous absorbent material attenuating through frictional effects: a similar effect may be produced by a porous absorbent liner in the common rail.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un système d'injection de carburant sous haute pression dans un moteur à combustion interne, à injection directe, comprenant notamment une pompe haute pression (7) reliée à une réserve de carburant (8), un rail commun (1) de distribution du carburant sous pression dans plusieurs moyens d'injection (3) débouchant chacun dans une chambre de combustion (4), au moins un conduit de liaison (2) entre le rail commun (1) et chaque moyen d'injection (3), un capteur de pression (9) disposé sur ledit rail commun (1), une unité de contrôle électronique (11) reliée à la fois aux moyens d'injection (3), à la pompe haute pression (7) et au capteur de pression (9). Conformément à l'invention, le système il comprend en outre un moyen (12) destiné à atténuer les ondes de pression dans chacun desdits moyens d'injection (3). Plus précisément ledit moyen d'atténuation (12) coopère avec l'un au moins desdits conduits de liaison (2) entre le rail commun (1) et l'un au moins desdits moyens d'injection (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; F02M 55/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2786225 A1 20000526; FR 2786225 B1 20001222; EP 1030052 A1 20000823; JP 2000161178 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI