Global Patent Index - EP 1030053 A2

EP 1030053 A2 2000-08-23 - Injector for an injection system of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Injector for an injection system of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Injektor für eine Einspritzanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Injecteur pour un dispositif d'injection d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1030053 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103161 A

Priority

DE 19906383 A

Abstract (en)

The injector (3) has a jet needle (9) displaced axially within aligned bores (10,11) provided by an intermediate body (2) and a jet body (1), for controlling the fuel feed to at least one injection opening (7) at the end of the jet body. The fuel is supplied to the side of a pressure chamber (6) within the jet body via a feed bore (4) in the intermediate body leading to a feed bore (5) in the jet body at an acute angle of more than 10 degrees to the jet needle bore.

Abstract (de)

Injektor (3) mit einem Zwischenkörper (2) mit einer ersten Führungsbohrung (10) und einem Düsenkörper (1) mit einer zweiten Führungsbohrung (11), in denen eine Düsennadel (9) geführt wird, einer Zulaufbohrung (5), die seitlich in eine Druckkammer (6) mündet. Durch den kurzen axialen Abstand zwischen der Druckkammer (6) und der Öffnung der zweiten Führungsbohrung (10) ist ein großer Winkel (a) zwischen der zweiten Zulaufbohrung (5) und der Führungsbohrung (11) möglich, wodurch die Druckfestigkeit im Bereich der Zwischenwand (11) zwischen der zweiten Zulaufbohrung (5) und der zweiten Führungsbohrung (10) erhöht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/04; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 55/008 (2013.01); F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030053 A2 20000823; EP 1030053 A3 20030514; DE 19906383 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/04 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/12 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/10 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI