Global Patent Index - EP 1030057 A1

EP 1030057 A1 2000-08-23 - HYDRAULIC PUMP OR MOTOR

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC PUMP OR MOTOR

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE PUMPE ODER MOTOR

Title (fr)

POMPE OU MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1030057 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947948 A

Priority

  • JP 9804732 W
  • JP 28696497 A

Abstract (en)

Pistons and shoes are allowed to slide slightly on contact surfaces thereof, but are surely prevented from separating from each other. There are provided a rotating disk rotatably supported in a housing, and a cylinder block rotatably supported in the housing. The cylinder block has an of rotation inclined relative to an axis of rotation of the rotating disk. A plurality of cylinder bores are arranged on a circle about the axis of rotation of the cylinder block, and pistons are slidably accommodated in the respective cylinder bores. Semi-spherical shoes having spherical surfaces contacted with the rotating disk and flat smooth surfaces on the opposite side contacted with the pistons are provided. Connecting devices are further provided for connecting the pistons and the shoes to each other. The connecting devices allow the pistons and shoes to slide on each other in a direction along their contact surfaces, but prevent them from moving in a direction away from each other. A valve plate fixed to the housing is slidably contacted with a bottom surface of the cylinder block, and allows successive inflow and outflow of a working fluid to and from the respective cylinder bores as the cylinder block rotates. A joint is provided to connect the rotating disk and the cylinder block to each other to cause synchronous rotation of both. Either the rotating disk or the cylinder block is connected to a drive shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/24; F04B 1/12; F04B 53/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/30 (2006.01); F04B 1/12 (2006.01); F04B 1/24 (2006.01); F04B 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/18 (2013.01); F04B 1/126 (2013.01); F04B 1/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1030057 A1 20000823; EP 1030057 A4 20040630; EP 1030057 B1 20070815; DE 69838260 D1 20070927; DE 69838260 T2 20071220; DK 1030057 T3 20071203; JP 3894463 B2 20070322; JP H11117856 A 19990427; WO 9920899 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151020

2016-05-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151031

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69838260

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141009

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-10-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838260 P 20070927

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2007-08-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 1/24 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 53/18 B

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 1/12 B

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE